MD SB845 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a tent is not required to have a sprinkler system if the tent is not used for lodging, serviced by a public water system, and attached to or incorporated as part of a building that is required to have a sprinkler system; defining a specified term; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Sprinkler System Requirements - Tents - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |