MD SB845 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian of a public record to deny inspection of the part of a public record that contains an electronic mail address of an individual who is not an employee of a unit or instrumentality of the State or of a political subdivision; exempting the judiciary department from the provisions of the Act; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Electronic Mail Addresses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {684434/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Counties
Disclosure
Inspections
Municipal Corporations
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Counties
Disclosure
Inspections
Municipal Corporations
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology