MD SB843 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving a public-private partnership agreement for the I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership Program unless the agreement includes that at least 10% of the toll revenue remaining after construction costs be deposited in a special fund to be used only for transit projects in accordance with a certain memoranda; authorizing the public-private partnership agreement to require a bidder to agree to initiate a community benefit agreement; etc.
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB67 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Budget and Taxation Finance
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bicycles
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Buses
Communications
Community Development
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Environmental Matters
Fees
Health
Highways
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Mass Transit
Minorities
Occupational Safety
Pedestrians
Privacy
Privatization
Public Works, Board of
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Bicycles
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Buses
Communications
Community Development
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Environmental Matters
Fees
Health
Highways
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Mass Transit
Minorities
Occupational Safety
Pedestrians
Privacy
Privatization
Public Works, Board of
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10A | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0843?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0843f.pdf |