MD SB843 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of certain materials, equipment, and supplies to a certain licensed caterer if, under certain circumstances, the materials, equipment, and supplies will be used by the caterer to perform a catering contract that includes the provision of food and beverages; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Caterers - Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-10HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-10HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-05SenateFloor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted
2020-03-05SenateMotion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Kagan) Rejected
2020-03-05SenateFloor Amendment {663724/5 (Senator Peters)
2020-03-05SenateFloor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters) Withdrawn
2020-03-04SenateMotion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Peters) Adopted
2020-03-04SenateFloor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters)
2020-03-03SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted
2020-03-03SenateFloor Amendment {663724/3 (Senator Peters)
2020-03-03SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-03SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Peters) Adopted
2020-03-03SenateFavorable
2020-02-28SenateMotion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2020-02-28SenateFavorable
2020-02-27SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-10SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB1023 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General11236(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback