MD SB843 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Real Estate Commission to transfer up to $500,000 to the Real Estate Guaranty Fund from the State Real Estate Commission Fund if the amount in the Guaranty Fund falls below $300,000 and the Commission is projected to have an operating surplus of at least $500,000 in the current fiscal year.
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Guaranty Fund - Fund Transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75 |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-02 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |