MD SB842 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a jury commissioner to provide prospective juror information concerning individuals who are not citizens of the United States to the State Board of Elections within 5 days after receiving the information; requiring the State Administrator of Elections to make specified arrangements to receive the information; requiring the State Administrator to retain a list of individuals whose information has been submitted; etc.
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Immigrants and Citizenship
Juries
Registration
Voting
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Immigrants and Citizenship
Juries
Registration
Voting