MD SB841 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing certain discharge permits to a person for a new industrial poultry operation or for the purpose of extending or expanding an industrial poultry operation in operation on or before September 30, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1312 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment9323(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9323.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback