MD SB840 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an ordinance enacted by St. Mary's County regarding property maintenance to provide for a voluntary agreement between the county and an owner of real property for remediation by the county of specified conditions constituting a nuisance; authorizing a voluntary agreement to provide for repayment by the property owner to the county of the costs of the remediation; providing that specified unpaid costs may be enforced by the filing of a lien; requiring St. Mary's County to record notice of the lien in the county land records; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {688171/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Nuisances
Real Property
Recordation
St. Mary's County
Counties - Local Laws
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Nuisances
Real Property
Recordation
St. Mary's County