MD SB835 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain county or municipality, after giving 60 days written notice to the electric company and the Public Service Commission, to convert its street lighting service to a certain alternative-energy-only tariff, submit a request to acquire certain street lighting equipment from the electric company, and enter into an agreement to purchase electricity for a certain use from any available electricity supplier under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-05SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1034 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government11309(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities4212(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback