MD SB834 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that value-based arrangements established under certain provisions of federal law are exempt from certain provisions of State law regulating health care practitioner referrals; providing that a health care practitioner or set of health care practitioners that accepts capitated payments in a certain manner but does not perform certain other acts is not considered to be performing acts of an insurance business; prohibiting participation in a certain arrangement from being the sole opportunity for increases in reimbursement; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Two-Sided Incentive Arrangements and Capitated Payments - Authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {433526/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1148 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Contracts
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 1008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 2102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 4 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |