MD SB829 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including income from certain retirement plans within a subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain retired individuals or individuals who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; repealing an obsolete reference to a certain provision relating to a rollover individual retirement account; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |