MD SB829 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that retired higher education faculty of the Teachers' Retirement System or Teachers' Pension System are subject to an earnings limitation based on specified final compensation, not including specified additional earnings, if they are reemployed by their former employer.
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Retired
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/4 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Retirement Systems
Salaries
State Universities and Colleges
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Retirement Systems
Salaries
State Universities and Colleges
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment