MD SB827 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying certain provisions of law related to the employment of certain individuals who are receiving certain allowances from the State Police Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Police Retirement System – Employment of Retirees – Clarifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {969734/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-18SenateHearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-02-18SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback