MD SB826 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program in the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation to provide loans to qualified commercial fishermen to continue commercial operations in the State; providing, beginning July 1, 2025, that generational watermen, beginner watermen, and seafood processing businesses are eligible to receive loans under the Program; and requiring that a loan made under the Program be at least $7,000 and not more than $15,000.
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {133521/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {783129/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1242 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Appropriations
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Debt Management
Economic Development
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Loans
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Debt Management
Economic Development
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Loans
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |