MD SB826 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an agent, a landlord, or an operator from making false representations or statements to tenants in violation of certain laws in Baltimore City; prohibiting certain individuals from making false representations or statements in connection with certain proceedings in Baltimore City; prohibiting certain individuals from trying to circumvent certain rights afforded to tenants in connection with the denial of ingress to or egress from a dwelling, intentionally diminishing certain services, or penalizing certain tenants; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {598877/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Eviction
Landlord and Tenant
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Public Local Laws
Real Property
Utilities
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Eviction
Landlord and Tenant
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Public Local Laws
Real Property
Utilities