MD SB825 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; providing that compliance with a certain federal law and certain federal regulations constitute compliance with certain provisions of the Maryland Consumer Loan Law; altering the maximum interest rates that a certain lender may charge for certain loans; etc.
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Damages
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Financial Institutions
Licenses
Loans
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Credit
Damages
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Financial Institutions
Licenses
Loans