MD SB820 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Human Services to implement policies requiring a local department of social services or the appropriate law enforcement agency that fails to conduct a child abuse or neglect investigation or complete a certain report within certain statutory time frames to report the delay and the reason for the delay in a certain manner; and requiring the Department to assess certain studies and methodologies, develop a certain assessment, and complete the assessment by certain dates.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Investigations - Timeliness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {243621/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion Withdraw Committee Amendment {873027/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Hettleman) Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1 Withdrawn |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {873027/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hettleman) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {873027/1 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1248 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Family Law
Human Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Notices
Records
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Time
Family Law
Human Services, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Notices
Records
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |