MD SB82 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 517
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 517
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Department of General Services has sole management responsibility for eMaryland Marketplace.
Title
Management of eMaryland Marketplace
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 517 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m. |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Communication
General Services, Department of
internet
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Communication
General Services, Department of
internet
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |