MD SB819 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that an alcoholic beverages inspector in Queen Anne's County or any member of the inspector's immediate family may not have a personal or financial interest, directly or indirectly, in a license, license holder, or licensed premises; specifying the powers and duties of an alcoholic beverages inspector in Queen Anne's County; requiring the Queen Anne's County Office of the Sheriff to enforce specified violations; providing that an inspector has no power of arrest; and requiring an inspector to take a specified oath.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Inspections
Interest
Oaths
Queen Anne's County
Sheriffs
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Inspections
Interest
Oaths
Queen Anne's County
Sheriffs