MD SB818 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain schools to remain eligible to participate in the Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of $7,550,000 for the Program in the annual budget bill; and defining "secondary schools" to include middle schools and high schools.
Title
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-13) (Y: 121 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-13) (Y: 121 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-13) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {805964/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {739032/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Education
Governor
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reimbursement Rates
Students
Time
Welfare
Education
Governor
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reimbursement Rates
Students
Time
Welfare