MD SB813 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 418
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a vehicle manufacturer to make certain requests of a person seeking to transfer a vehicle dealer franchise or any right under a vehicle dealer franchise within 20 days after receiving notice of the proposed transfer; requiring a vehicle manufacturer to consent to a transfer or provide a written statement with specific grounds for refusing consent within 75 days of receiving all completed forms and requested information from the transferor; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Transfers of Franchises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 418
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (99-36)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-16HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {588477/1 Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1064 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 417

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation15211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback