MD SB812 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of source of income; stating the Act seeks to deconcentrate poverty by providing additional opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in certain neighborhoods; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of source of income; establishing qualifications and limitations on the prohibition against discrimination in housing based on source of income; etc.
Title
Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Alimony
Apartments
Commerce and Business
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Condominiums
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Estates and Trusts
Fraud
Gifts
Housing
Human Relations
Investigations and Inquiries
Leases and Rent
Notices
Prices
Publications
Real Estate
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
Threats
Violence
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment
Alimony
Apartments
Commerce and Business
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Condominiums
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Estates and Trusts
Fraud
Gifts
Housing
Human Relations
Investigations and Inquiries
Leases and Rent
Notices
Prices
Publications
Real Estate
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Aid
Threats
Violence
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment