MD SB812 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the list of persons to whom a person may report suspected insurance fraud and not be subject to civil liability; and providing that a person is not subject to civil liability for furnishing or receiving information related to suspected, anticipated, or completed fraudulent insurance acts under specified circumstances.
Title
Insurance - Suspected Fraud - Liability for Reporting or for Furnishing or
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 977172/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Civil Actions
Disclosure
Finance Companies
Fraud
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Reports
Civil Actions
Disclosure
Finance Companies
Fraud
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Reports