MD SB811 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Maryland Judiciary Case Search from in any way referring to the existence of certain records relating to certain cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure – Maryland Judiciary Case Search – Case Blocking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {348979/1 Adopted
2020-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure10105.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback