MD SB810 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Highway Administration to post information on suicide prevention, including a hotline number, on electronic signs along any highway within a 5-mile radius of a high suicide risk zone, as identified by the Administration; and authorizing the Administration to adopt certain regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Highway Administration - Electronic Signs Along Highways - Suicide Prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-16HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-12HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-09SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-02-21SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-21SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation8662(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback