MD SB81 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that in lieu of or in addition to suspension of the license, a maximum monetary penalty of $5,000 may be imposed by the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners for a first offense; and providing that in addition to suspension or revocation of the license, the board may impose a maximum penalty of not more than $10,000 for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - License Suspensions and
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-10-05 | Pre-filed |