MD SB808 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - First Reading Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight to study and make recommendations on the use of and restrictions on revenue from video lottery terminals and table games received by local governments; requiring the Committee to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; and providing for the termination of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight – Local Government Use of Casino Revenue and Problem Gambling Fund – Report

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {299237/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback