MD SB807 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from presenting certain victims of sexually assaultive behavior with forms purporting to limit the obligations of the criminal justice unit to the victim or limit the rights of the victim; authorizing victims affected by a violation of the Act to bring an action for injunctive or declaratory relief; requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt and submit policies for enforcing the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-03-18HouseHearing 3/18 at 9:00 a.m.
2020-03-17HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {278272/1 Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1575 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure11929(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback