MD SB807 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain continuing education courses required by the State Real Estate Commission to include the principles of real estate brokerage relationships and disclosures; prohibiting licensees of the commission from disclosing confidential information obtained from a prospective client in anticipation of forming a brokerage relationship, unless the prospective client consents in writing to the disclosure; etc.
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634734/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Disclosure
Licenses
Real Property
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Disclosure
Licenses
Real Property