MD SB806 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain provision relating to the effect of a redemption or extinguishment of a certain ground rent to provide that it is effective to conclusively divest a certain ground lease holder of a certain reversion and vest the reversion in a certain leasehold tenant, and eliminate certain rights, title, or interest of certain individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-16HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {898570/1 Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1182 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property8801(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8804(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback