MD SB804 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Board of Governors of the Garrett County Memorial Hospital; altering the terms of the members of the Board; and reducing the mandatory number of Board meetings from 10 to 6.
Title
Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board Membership and Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1127 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Garrett County
Hospitals
Local Government Mandates
meetings
Counties - Local Laws
Garrett County
Hospitals
Local Government Mandates
meetings
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Garrett County | 36.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |