MD SB804 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of Charles County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling located in the county that is owned by a certain public safety officer; requiring the credit to equal 50% of the property tax imposed on the dwelling; authorizing the governing body of Charles County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-28HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-28HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-25SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-02-25SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-02-24SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9310(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback