MD SB803 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "legislative unit" to include a caucus of members of the General Assembly officially recognized by a presiding officer of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Ethics - Legislative Unit - Definition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB397 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions5101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions5505(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback