MD SB803 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "legislative unit" to include a caucus of members of the General Assembly officially recognized by a presiding officer of the General Assembly.
Title
Public Ethics - Legislative Unit - Definition
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB397 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |