MD SB803 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception to the privilege of communications of a patient or client if the disclosure is necessary to prove a charge in a specified criminal proceeding against the patient, former patient, client, or former client; creating an exception to the privilege of communications of a patient or client if the disclosure is necessary to obtain relief in a peace order proceeding in which a specified health care professional is a petitioner and the patient, former patient, client, or former client is a respondent; etc.
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counselors
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Harassment
Health Occupations
Mental Health
Nurses
Patients
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Protection Orders
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Social Workers
Trials
Counselors
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Harassment
Health Occupations
Mental Health
Nurses
Patients
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Protection Orders
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Social Workers
Trials