MD SB802 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting from the property tax property that is owned by the Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc., and used exclusively for education of the public, encouraging agriculture in the State, assisting in the dissemination of information relating to agriculture, or the maintenance of a natural or recreational area for public use; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (130-3)
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-28HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-28HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-25SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-02-25SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-02-24SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB889 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property7246(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback