MD SB80 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB312
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, and Taylors Island, in Dorchester County; providing that a person who operates a golf car on a highway in Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, and Taylors Island may operate the golf cart only on highways on which the maximum speed does not exceed 30 miles per hour between dawn and dusk and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; requiring the operator to have a valid driver's license; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB193 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
SB312 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Referred Environment and Transportation
SB312 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Boundaries
Dorchester County
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Dorchester County
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 13 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 104.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |