MD SB80 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact to be the Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact; altering the purpose of the Compact to provide emergency management mutual assistance among jurisdictions and mutual cooperation in emergency management-related activities; requiring a certain official to designate more than one authorized representative for receiving requests for assistance; requiring written requests for assistance to include the functional areas for which assistance is needed; etc.
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 287 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {214635/1 Adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Communications
Counties
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Forms
Jurisdiction
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Names
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Safety
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Rescue Squads
Counties
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Forms
Jurisdiction
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Names
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Safety
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Rescue Squads
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |