MD SB796 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to ensure that providers of and individuals who receive certain services are not negatively impacted when using a certain software system or function; requiring that an individual receiving certain services who receives a certain notice have 90 days to appeal a certain eligibility determination; requiring certain services to continue uninterrupted under certain circumstances until the outcome of a certain appeal is complete; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental Disabilities Administration - Program Changes and Required Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-15HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {627177/1 Adopted
2020-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-02-17SenateHearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB984 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General7309(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback