MD SB794 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Wicomico County or the governing body of a municipal corporation in Wicomico County to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property that is used for certain hotel or residential development projects that add substantially to the assessed value of the property; authorizing the governing body of Wicomico County or the governing body of a municipal corporation in Wicomico County to provide for certain matters relating to the property tax credit; etc.
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1179 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Subjects
Construction
Hotels and Motels
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Wicomico County
Hotels and Motels
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Wicomico County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |