MD SB794 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering an exception to the requirement that an individual be admitted to the Maryland Bar before the individual may practice law in the State by authorizing an individual who is admitted to the bar of any other state to provide legal advice to the individual's employer or the employer's organizational affiliates.
Title
Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {858676/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys
Business Regulation and Occupations
Contracts
Corporations
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Interstate Affairs
Securities
Voting
Work, Labor and Employment
Business Regulation and Occupations
Contracts
Corporations
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Interstate Affairs
Securities
Voting
Work, Labor and Employment