MD SB793 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain appropriations for certain Baltimore City youth programs; establishing the Law Enforcement Cadet Apprenticeship Program to provide career opportunities in law enforcement; authorizing the Johns Hopkins University to establish a police department under certain circumstances; prohibiting the police department from acquiring certain aircraft, drones, vehicles, or weapons; requiring University police officers to wear and use body-worn cameras in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Safety and Strengthening Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-2) (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {893927/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected (29-105) (Y: 29 N: 105 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {513529/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected (20-112) (Y: 20 N: 112 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {393421/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected (26-108) (Y: 26 N: 108 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-42) (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 25
2019-04-01SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (42-2)
2019-04-01SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29SenateSpecial Order until 4/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
2019-03-28HouseFloor Amendment {563923/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected
2019-03-28HouseFloor Amendment {813324/1 (Delegate Acevero) Rejected
2019-03-28HouseFloor Amendment {393421/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected (26-108)
2019-03-28HouseFloor Amendment {513529/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected (20-112)
2019-03-28HouseFloor Amendment {203223/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected
2019-03-28HouseFloor Amendment {893927/1 (Delegate Mosby) Rejected (29-105)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27HouseFloor Amendment {123122/1 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2019-03-26HouseSpecial Order until 03/27 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2019-03-26HouseFloor Amendment {663121/2 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {422713/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (43-2)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {843522/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {673427/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {493229/2 (Senator Washington) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {233328/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {673221/4 (Senator Washington) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {753029/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {503623/1 (Senator Washington) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {853720/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {643628/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {653523/1 (Senator Washington) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {408976/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-12SenateSpecial Order until 3/13 (Senator Carter) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {408976/1
2019-03-11SenateLaid Over (Senator Washington) Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {408976/1
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0793&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0793f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0793t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0793e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_25_sb0793e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_40897601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_23332801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_49322902.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_50362301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_64362801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_65352301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_67322104.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_67342701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_75302901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_84352201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_85372001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_42271301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_66312102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_12312201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_20322301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_39342101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_51352901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_56392301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_81332401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0793_89392701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0793.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0793_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0561.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0793_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0975.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0976.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0977.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0978.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0923.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback