MD SB788 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, except as otherwise provided by law, the Public Information Act does not authorize a custodian of records to allow the inspection of the Social Security number or date of birth of an individual except to a person in interest; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a custodian to deny inspection of a certain part of a personal surveillance video; requiring that a victim who is the subject of a record that is denied inspection be notified of all requests to inspect the record; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {873425/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted (37-6) (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873425/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted (37-6) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873425/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counties
Death
Domestic Violence
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Legislation
Municipal Corporations
News Media
Notices
Police Training Commission
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Sexual Offenses
Social Security
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Victims
Video
Death
Domestic Violence
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Legislation
Municipal Corporations
News Media
Notices
Police Training Commission
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Sexual Offenses
Social Security
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Victims
Video