MD SB787 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting, from a certain tax on annual gross revenues derived from digital advertising services in the State, advertisement services on digital interfaces owned or operated by or operated on behalf of a broadcast entity and news media entity; prohibiting a person who derives gross revenues from digital advertising in the State from passing on the cost to a certain customer; allowing, for a certain taxable year, a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for certain utility arrearages forgiven during that taxable year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Floor Amendment 233429/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (95-43)
2021-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {255361/1 Adopted
2021-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-09HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-08HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-03-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-04SenateFloor Amendment {233429/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31)
2021-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {219934/1 Adopted
2021-03-03SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2021-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {219934/1
2021-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-02-05SenateHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-05SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB1200 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General5102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0787?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0787f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0787t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0787e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_669_sb0787e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0787_21993401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0787_23342901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0787_25536101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0333.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0354.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1283.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1156.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback