MD SB785 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appoint or reappoint a member of the State Board of Education on or before January 1 of the year in which the member's term expires; requiring members appointed to the State Board to reasonably reflect specified demographic diversity of the State, to the extent practicable; establishing qualifications for members of the Board; requiring a member's term to begin on the July 1 after appointment; requiring the Accountability and Implementation Board to contract with a consultant to conduct a certain study; etc.
Title
State Board of Education Membership and Terms - Capability and Capacity Study of Education Agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Washington) Rejected |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {775260/1 Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864933/1 Adopted |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Demographics
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Gender
Higher Education
Language
Managers and Supervisors
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Time
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Demographics
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Gender
Higher Education
Language
Managers and Supervisors
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Time