MD SB784 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the time period from 30 to 45 days within which a covered employee must report to the employer a hernia caused by an accidental personal injury or by a strain arising out of and in the course of employment for the purpose of filing a claim for compensation; authorizing a covered employee to file a claim for compensation for a hernia caused by an accidental personal injury within 2 years after the date the accidental personal injury occurred under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation - Hernia Claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (102-31)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-15HouseHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-12HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-10SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-09SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment9504(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment9709(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback