MD SB784 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the administrative and operational expense cap of the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System and the State Retirement Agency for fiscal years 2019 through 2022 under certain circumstances; altering the basis for the calculation of the administrative and operational expense cap; applying the Act; and making certain sections of the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act.
Title
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 724 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |