MD SB783 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a health care provider, before each administration of a human papillomavirus vaccine, to provide an individual with a certain information sheet and obtain written consent on a certain form; requiring that a certain information sheet include, at a minimum, certain statements; requiring that a certain consent form developed by the Maryland Department of Health include certain information; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-08SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback