MD SB782 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority and the University System of Maryland, by regulation, to establish certain procedures for each bidder, contractor, or subcontractor that performs work on certain construction projects to certify that the bidder, contractor, or subcontractor pays certain employee health care expenses; authorizing a certain bidder, contractor, or subcontractor to demonstrate the payment of certain employee health care expenses in a certain manner on or before July 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB583 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 264

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement17801(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement17802(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement17803(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback