MD SB779 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB367
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1452
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1452
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person, for the management of the deer population in the State, to sponsor, conduct, or participate in a certain contest in the State that has the objective of harvesting a female deer.
Title
Natural Resources - Female Deer Hunting Contests - Authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB779 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1452 (Carry Over) 2022-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB934 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (31-2)
HB1452 (Carry Over) 2022-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB934 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (31-2)
Subjects
Animals
Awards, Medals, and Prizes
Contests
Fines
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Weights and Measures
Awards, Medals, and Prizes
Contests
Fines
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0779?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0779f.pdf |